CASTILLO LARA, S.D.B., Rosalio José (1922-
Birth. September 4, 1922, San Casimiro, diocese of Maracay, Venezuela. Nephew of Lucas Guillermo Castillo, archbishop of Caracas.
Education. Joined the Pious Society of St. Francis de Sales (Salesians of Don Bosco), Bogotá, Colombia; Salesian houses of study, Colombia. Salesian Athenaeum, Turin (doctorate in canon law); University of Bonn, Germany.
Priesthood. Ordained, September 4, 1949, Caracas. Director of studies, St. Joseph Institute, Los Teques, 1949-1950. Further studies, 1950-1953, Turin. President of Venezuelan Association of Catholic Educators, 1953. Faculty member, Salesian Athenaeum, 1954-1957, Turin; 1957-1965, Rome. Further research, 1962, Bonn. Numerary member of Institute of Research and Study in Medieval Law, Toronto. Provincial of Salesian Society in Venezuela, January 1966-August 1967; regional assistant for Latin America, Southern Cone, 1967-1971; general counselor for pastoral care for youth, 1971-1973.
Episcopate. Elected titular bishop of Precausa and appointed coadjutor, with right of succession, of Trujillo, Venezuela, March 26, 1973. Consecrated, May 24, 1973, Caracas, by Cardinal José Humberto Quintero Parra, archbishop of Caracas. Attended III Ordinary Assembly of World Synod of Bishops, Vatican City, September 27-October 26, 1974. Secretary of Pontifical Commission for Revision of Code of Canon Law, February 12, 1975. Attended III General Conference of Latin American Episcopal Council, Puebla, México, January 27-February 13, 1979. President of Disciplinary Commission of Roman Curia, October 5, 1981. Pro-president of Pontifical Commission for Revision of Code of Canon Law, May 22, 1982. Promoted to archbishop, May 26, 1982. Pro-president of Pontifical Commission for Authentic Interpretation of Code of Canon Law, January 18, 1984.
Cardinalate. Created cardinal deacon, May 25, 1985; received red biretta and deaconry of Nostra Signora di Coromoto in S. Giovanni di Dio, May 25, 1985. President of Pontifical Commission for Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law, May 27, 1985. Attended II Extraordinary Assembly of World Synod of Bishops, Vatican City, November 24-December 8, 1985; VII Ordinary Assembly of World Synod of Bishops, Vatican City, October 1-30, 1987. President of Administration of Patrimony of Apostolic See, December 6, 1989. Attended VIII Ordinary Assembly of World Synod of Bishops, Vatican City, September 30-October 28, 1990. President of the Pontifical Commission for the State of Vatican City, October 31, 1990. Attended Special Assembly of World Synod of Bishops for Europe, Vatican City, November 28-December 14, 1991. Special papal envoy to 4th National Marian Congress, Guanare, Venezuela, May 29-31, 1992. Attended Special Assembly of World Synod of Bishops for Africa, Vatican City, April 10-May 8, 1994; IX Ordinary Assembly of World Synod of Bishops, Vatican City, October 2-29, 1994. Resigned presidency of Administration, June 24, 1995. Opted for order of priests and deaconry was elevated pro hac vice to title, January 29, 1996. Special papal envoy to closing ceremonies of V centennial of St. John of God's birth, Granada, Spain, March 7-8, 1996. Resigned presidency, October 14, 1997. Attended Special Assembly for America of World Synod of Bishops, Vatican City, November 16-December 12, 1997. Returned to live in Venezuela, 1997. Special papal envoy to the Third Colombian National Eucharistic Congress, Cali, October 16-18 1999. Special papal envoy to II Regional Eucharistic Congress of the Antilles, May 18-21, 2000, Castries, St. Lucie. Special papal envoy to National Eucharistic Congress of Argentina, Córdoba, September 8-10, 2000. Lost the right to participate in the conclave when turned 80 years of age, September 4, 2002.
Vatican's Biography
http://www.stjohnxxiii.com/Cardinals/The_Cardinals_of_the_Church/bios-c.htmHis position in the Hierarchy (He is nothing but a Canon-lawyer as opposed to someone who actaully decides things for the Vatican):
http://www.catholic-hierarchy.org/bishop/bcaslar.html